+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 25, 2012 in the House:
- Enrolled and presented to Secretary of State on Monday, April 02, 2012
On March 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Adopted; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
On March 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Be adopted
On March 12, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending resolution be adopted by Committee on Judiciary
On March 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Wednesday, March 07, 2012, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
On February 22, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 21, 2012 in the House:
- Final Action - Adopted as amended; Yea: 123 Nay: 0
- Engrossed on Tuesday, 21 February 2012
On February 20, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be adopted as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Colloton was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Colloton
On February 15, 2012 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending resolution be adopted by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
On February 10, 2012 in the House:
- Hearing: Tuesday, February 14, 2012, 1:30 PM Room 144-S
On February 2, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
On February 1, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Amendment
FA_2012_HCR5032_H_4257
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Colloton was adopted
+ − Votes (2)
March 15, 2012: Final Action - Adopted
February 21, 2012: Final Action - Adopted as amended
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
Type:
Primary Sponsor