+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On February 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Emergency Final Action - Not adopted by required 2/3 majority; Yea: 26 Nay: 14
- Committee of the Whole - Be adopted as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Huntington was adopted Yea: 21 Nay: 19
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Huntington
- Committee of the Whole - Rereferred to Yea: 19 Nay: 20 Committee on Judiciary
On February 6, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending resolution be adopted by Committee on Judiciary
On May 11, 2011 in the House:
- Engrossed on Friday, 11 February 2011
On March 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Friday, March 18, 2011, 8:30 AM Room 548-S
On February 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 11, 2011 in the House:
- Final Action - Adopted as amended; Yea: 91 Nay: 27
On February 10, 2011 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be adopted as amended Yea: 93 Nay: 26
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On February 4, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending resolution be adopted as amended by Committee on Health and Human Services
On February 3, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services
On January 28, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced
- Hearing: Monday, January 31, 2011, 1:30 PM Room 784 DSOB
+ − Amendment
FA_2012_HCR5007_S_4421
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Huntington was adopted Yea: 21 Nay: 19
+ − Votes (5)
February 23, 2012: Committee of the Whole - Rereferred to Committee on Judiciary
February 23, 2012: Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Huntington was adopted
February 23, 2012: Emergency Final Action - Not adopted by required 2/3 majority
February 11, 2011: Final Action - Adopted as amended
February 10, 2011: Committee of the Whole - Be adopted as amended
+ − Sponsors (56)
Type:
Primary Sponsor