+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On June 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Died in Senate Committee
On March 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
On March 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On March 27, 2012 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 68 Nay: 55
- Engrossed on Tuesday, 27 March 2012
On March 26, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Grange was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Grange
On March 14, 2012 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Appropriations
On February 21, 2012 in the House:
- Hearing: Wednesday, February 29, 2012, 9:00 AM Room 346-S
On February 15, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On February 14, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Amendment
FA_2012_HB2745_H_5228
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Grange was adopted
+ − Vote
March 27, 2012: Final Action - Passed as amended
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Appropriations
Type:
Primary Sponsor