+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On June 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Died in Senate Committee
On March 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On March 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On March 26, 2012 in the House:
- Engrossed on Monday, 26 March 2012
On March 21, 2012 in the House:
- Representative Brookens raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled germane.
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Kiegerl
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Kiegerl was withdrawn
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 122 Nay: 0
On March 16, 2012 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary
On March 8, 2012 in the House:
- Hearing: Tuesday, March 13, 2012, 3:30 PM Room 346-S
- Hearing: Tuesday, March 13, 2012, 3:30 PM Room 346-S
On February 23, 2012 in the House:
- Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Rereferred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 15, 2012 in the House:
- Withdrawn from Committee on Judiciary; Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On February 13, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 10, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (2)
FA_2012_HB2741_H_5040
Representative Brookens raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled germane.
CR_2012_HB2741_H_4911
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
+ − Vote
March 21, 2012: Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Judiciary
Type:
Primary Sponsor