+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 30, 2014 in the House:
- Approved by Governor on Wednesday, 14 May 2014
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, May 09, 2014
On May 2, 2014 in the House:
- Concurred with amendments in conference; Yea: 122 Nay: 0
- Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Motion to accede adopted; Senator Lynn, Senator Wagle and Senator Holland appointed as conferees
On March 31, 2014 in the House:
- Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Kleeb , Representative Suellentrop and Representative Frownfelter as conferees
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
- Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
On March 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Wednesday, March 19, 2014, 8:30 AM Room 548-S
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce
On March 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 118 Nay: 0
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Withdrawn from Committee on Taxation; Rereferred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Taxation
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing: Friday, February 21, 2014, 1:30 PM Room 346-S
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (3)
CR_2014_HB2721_S_4157
Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
CR_2014_HB2721_H_3672
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
CR_2014_HB2721_H_3856
Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Taxation
+ − Votes (3)
May 2, 2014: Concurred with amendments in conference
March 25, 2014: Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed as amended
March 14, 2014: Final Action - Substitute passed
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Judiciary
Type:
Primary Sponsor