+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On June 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Died in Senate Committee
On February 29, 2012 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Wednesday, March 07, 2012, 1:30 PM Room 548-S
On February 22, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Utilities
On February 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 21, 2012 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed; Yea: 123 Nay: 0
On February 16, 2012 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by Committee on Energy and Utilities
On February 10, 2012 in the House:
- Hearing: Thursday, February 16, 2012, 9:00 AM Room 785-DSOB
- Referred to Committee on Energy and Utilities
On February 9, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Vote
February 21, 2012: Final Action - Passed
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Appropriations
Type:
Primary Sponsor