+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On June 1, 2012 in the House:
- Approved by Governor on Friday, 25 May 2012
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Monday, May 21, 2012
On May 16, 2012 in the House:
- Engrossed on Wednesday, 16 May 2012
On May 14, 2012 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 109 Nay: 7
- Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
On March 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
- Conference committee report now available
On March 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Motion to accede adopted; Senator Owens, Senator King and Senator Haley appointed as conferees
On March 21, 2012 in the House:
- Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Colloton , Representative Kinzer and Representative Pauls as conferees
On March 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
On March 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary
On March 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Monday, March 12, 2012, 12:00 PM Room 159-S
On March 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 29, 2012 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 23, 2012 in the House:
- Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 124 Nay: 0
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed
On February 16, 2012 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Government Efficiency
On February 10, 2012 in the House:
- Hearing: Tuesday, February 14, 2012, 3:30 PM Room Room 546-S
- Referred to Committee on Government Efficiency
On February 9, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (2)
CCR_2012_HB2704_S_5272
Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
CR_2012_HB2704_S_4754
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
+ − Votes (4)
May 14, 2012: Conference Committee Report was adopted
March 30, 2012: Conference Committee Report was adopted
March 15, 2012: Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended
February 23, 2012: Emergency Final Action - Passed
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Government Efficiency
Type:
Primary Sponsor