+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (38)
On June 1, 2012 in the House:
- Approved by Governor on Friday, 25 May 2012
On May 18, 2012 in the House:
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, May 18, 2012
On May 16, 2012 in the House:
- Engrossed on Tuesday, 15 May 2012
On May 11, 2012 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 97 Nay: 24
- Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
On May 9, 2012 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
- Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
- Conference committee report now available
On March 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- Motion to accede adopted; Senator Brungardt, Senator Reitz and Senator Faust-Goudeau appointed as conferees
On March 30, 2012 in the House:
- Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Brunk , Representative Patton and Representative Loganbill as conferees
On March 29, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Abrams
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Abrams was withdrawn
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Brungardt
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Brungardt was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Abrams
- Senator Holland motioned to divide Amendment
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Abrams Part 1 was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Abrams Part 2 was adopted Yea: 26 Nay: 13
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Steineger
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Steineger was rejected
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator V. Schmidt
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator V. Schmidt was rejected
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Holland
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Holland was rejected
- Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed as amended
- Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed as amended; Yea: 36 Nay: 2
On March 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Federal and State Affairs
On March 20, 2012 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Wednesday, March 21, 2012, 12:00 PM Room At the rail
On March 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs
On March 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On March 13, 2012 in the House:
- Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 107 Nay: 16
On March 12, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
On March 7, 2012 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Federal and State Affairs
On March 1, 2012 in the House:
- Hearing: Monday, March 05, 2012, 1:30 PM Room 346-S
On February 9, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs
On February 8, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (8)
CCR_2012_HB2689_S_5496
Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
FA_2012_HB2689_S_5322
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Holland was rejected
FA_2012_HB2689_S_5255
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator V. Schmidt was rejected
FA_2012_HB2689_S_5312
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Steineger was rejected
FA_2012_HB2689_S_5258
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Brungardt was adopted
CR_2012_HB2689_S_5134
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
FA_2012_HB2689_S_5243
Senator Holland motioned to divide Amendment
CR_2012_HB2689_H_4542
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
+ − Votes (5)
May 11, 2012: Conference Committee Report was adopted
May 9, 2012: Conference Committee Report was adopted
March 29, 2012: Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed as amended
March 13, 2012: Final Action - Substitute passed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor