+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On June 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Died in Senate Committee
On March 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
On February 29, 2012 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 23, 2012 in the House:
- Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 124 Nay: 0
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed
On February 16, 2012 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Government Efficiency
On February 10, 2012 in the House:
- Hearing: Tuesday, February 14, 2012, 3:30 PM Room Room 546-S
On February 9, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Government Efficiency
On February 8, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Vote
February 23, 2012: Emergency Final Action - Passed
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Government Efficiency
Type:
Primary Sponsor