+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 29, 2012 in the House:
- Approved by Governor on Thursday, 29 March 2012
On March 26, 2012 in the House:
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, March 23, 2012
On March 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Passed; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
On March 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed
On March 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Local Government
On March 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
On February 29, 2012 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 23, 2012 in the House:
- Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 119 Nay: 5
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative LeDoux was rejected
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative LeDoux
On February 17, 2012 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Government Efficiency
On February 10, 2012 in the House:
- Hearing: Thursday, February 16, 2012, 3:30 PM Room Room 546-S
- Withdrawn from Committee on Local Government; Referred to Committee on Government Efficiency
On February 9, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
On February 8, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Amendment
FA_2012_HB2677_H_4412
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative LeDoux was rejected
+ − Votes (2)
March 15, 2012: Final Action - Passed
February 23, 2012: Emergency Final Action - Passed
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Government Efficiency
Type:
Primary Sponsor