+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 28, 2012 in the House:
- Approved by Governor on Wednesday, 28 March 2012
On March 26, 2012 in the House:
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, March 23, 2012
On March 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Passed; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
On March 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed
On March 12, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Local Government
On February 29, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
On February 23, 2012 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 114 Nay: 10
- Engrossed on Thursday, 23 February 2012
On February 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 22, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Tietze was rejected Yea: 36 Nay: 77
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Tietze
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On February 16, 2012 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Commerce and Economic Development
On February 9, 2012 in the House:
- Hearing: Tuesday, February 14, 2012, 3:00 PM Room 785 Docking
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Economic Development
On February 8, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (2)
CR_2012_HB2666_H_4166
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
FA_2012_HB2666_H_4354
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Tietze was rejected Yea: 36 Nay: 77
+ − Votes (3)
March 15, 2012: Final Action - Passed
February 23, 2012: Final Action - Passed as amended
February 22, 2012: Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Tietze was rejected
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Commerce and Economic Development
Type:
Primary Sponsor