+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On May 23, 2022 in the House:
- Died on Calendar
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations and re-referred to Committee of the Whole
On February 23, 2022 in the House:
- Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On February 17, 2022 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
On February 15, 2022 in the House:
- Hearing: Tuesday, February 15, 2022, 1:30 PM Room 546-S
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
- Introduced
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
Type:
Primary Sponsor