+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 11, 2012 in the House:
- Approved by Governor on Thursday, 10 May 2012
On May 4, 2012 in the House:
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, May 04, 2012
On May 2, 2012 in the House:
- Reengrossed on Wednesday, 02 May 2012
On May 1, 2012 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 117 Nay: 3
- Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
On April 25, 2012 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
- Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
- Conference committee report now available
On March 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Motion to accede adopted; Senator Owens, Senator King and Senator Haley appointed as conferees
On March 21, 2012 in the House:
- Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Kinzer , Representative Patton and Representative Pauls as conferees
On March 20, 2012 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
On March 19, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
On March 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary
On March 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Thursday, March 15, 2012, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
On March 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 29, 2012 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 29, 2012 in the House:
- Engrossed on Tuesday, 28 February 2012
On February 23, 2012 in the House:
- Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 122 Nay: 2
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On February 21, 2012 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary
On February 8, 2012 in the House:
- Hearing: Thursday, February 16, 2012, 3:30 PM Room 346-S
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 7, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (3)
CCR_2012_HB2655_S_5332
Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
CR_2012_HB2655_H_4300
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
CR_2012_HB2655_S_4830
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
+ − Votes (4)
May 1, 2012: Conference Committee Report was adopted
April 25, 2012: Conference Committee Report was adopted
March 20, 2012: Final Action - Passed as amended
February 23, 2012: Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Judiciary
Type:
Primary Sponsor