+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On May 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Died in Senate Committee
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Wednesday, March 21, 2018, 10:30 AM Room 144-S
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 117 Nay: 0
- Engrossed on Wednesday, February 21, 2018
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Hearing: Wednesday, February 14, 2018, 01:30 PM Room 152-S
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
- Introduced
+ − Amendment
CR_2018_HB2648_H_3340
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
Type:
Primary Sponsor