+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On June 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Died on Senate General Orders
On April 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar
- Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
On March 29, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar
On March 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Committee on Ways and Means and re-referred to Committee of the Whole
On March 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
On March 20, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary
On March 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Tuesday, March 13, 2012, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
On February 29, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 23, 2012 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 106 Nay: 18
- Engrossed on Thursday, 23 February 2012
On February 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 22, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Bruchman was rejected
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Bruchman
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On February 20, 2012 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary
On February 8, 2012 in the House:
- Hearing: Tuesday, February 14, 2012, 3:30 PM Room 346-S
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 7, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (3)
CR_2012_HB2647_S_5065
Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
FA_2012_HB2647_H_4379
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Bruchman was rejected
CR_2012_HB2647_H_4261
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
+ − Vote
February 23, 2012: Final Action - Passed as amended
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Judiciary
Type:
Primary Sponsor