+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On May 23, 2022 in the House:
- Died on Calendar
On March 18, 2022 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Insurance and Pensions
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Rereferred to Committee on Insurance and Pensions
On February 23, 2022 in the House:
- Withdrawn from Committee on Insurance and Pensions; Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On February 14, 2022 in the House:
- Hearing: Monday, February 14, 2022, 3:30 PM Room 218-N
On February 8, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Insurance and Pensions
- Introduced
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Insurance and Pensions
Type:
Primary Sponsor