+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On June 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Died in Senate Committee
On March 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
On March 19, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary
On March 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Tuesday, March 06, 2012, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 29, 2012 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 29, 2012 in the House:
- Engrossed on Tuesday, 28 February 2012
On February 23, 2012 in the House:
- Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 114 Nay: 10
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On February 21, 2012 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary
On February 8, 2012 in the House:
- Hearing: Monday, February 13, 2012, 3:30 PM Room 346-S
On February 6, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 3, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (2)
CR_2012_HB2629_S_4963
Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
CR_2012_HB2629_H_4302
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
+ − Vote
February 23, 2012: Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Judiciary
Type:
Primary Sponsor