+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 6, 2018 in the House:
- Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 5, 2018
On April 3, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, April 03, 2018
On March 28, 2018 in the House:
- Concurred with amendments; Yea: 122 Nay: 2
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Ethics, Elections and Local Government
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Tuesday, March 06, 2018, 09:30 AM Room 142-S
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Ethics, Elections and Local Government
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 118 Nay: 0
- Engrossed on Monday, February 19, 2018
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Local Government
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Hearing: Tuesday, February 13, 2018, 01:30 PM Room 281-N
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (2)
CR_2018_HB2628_S_3726
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
CR_2018_HB2628_H_3268
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Local Government
Type:
Primary Sponsor