+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On June 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Died on Senate General Orders
On March 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Commerce
On March 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Tuesday, March 13, 2012, 8:30 AM Room 548-S
On March 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce
On February 29, 2012 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 29, 2012 in the House:
- Engrossed on Tuesday, 28 February 2012
On February 23, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Slattery was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Slattery
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Slattery was rejected
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Slattery
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 93 Nay: 31
On February 17, 2012 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Commerce and Economic Development
On February 8, 2012 in the House:
- Hearing: Tuesday, February 14, 2012, 3:00 PM Room 785 Docking
On February 6, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Economic Development
On February 3, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (4)
CR_2012_HB2627_S_4706
Died on Senate General Orders
FA_2012_HB2627_H_4403
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Slattery was rejected
FA_2012_HB2627_H_4404
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Slattery was adopted
CR_2012_HB2627_H_4213
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
+ − Vote
February 23, 2012: Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Commerce and Economic Development
Type:
Primary Sponsor