+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 30, 2014 in the House:
- Approved by Governor on Monday, 12 May 2014
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, May 06, 2014
On May 2, 2014 in the House:
- Concurred with amendments in conference; Yea: 94 Nay: 30
- Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Motion to accede adopted; Senator Lynn, Senator Wagle and Senator Holland appointed as conferees
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Kleeb , Representative Suellentrop and Representative Frownfelter as conferees
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 32 Nay: 8
On March 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Thursday, March 13, 2014, 8:30 AM Room 548-S
- Referred to Committee on Commerce
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 93 Nay: 30
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing: Monday, February 24, 2014, 1:30 PM Room 346-S
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development
- Introduced
+ − Amendment
CR_2014_HB2616_H_3682
Committee of the Whole - Be passed
+ − Votes (3)
May 2, 2014: Concurred with amendments in conference
March 25, 2014: Final Action - Substitute passed
February 27, 2014: Emergency Final Action - Passed
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development
Type:
Primary Sponsor