+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 25, 2012 in the House:
- Approved by Governor on Wednesday, 04 April 2012
On March 30, 2012 in the House:
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, March 30, 2012
On March 20, 2012 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Passed; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
On March 19, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed
- Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar
On March 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Transportation
On February 29, 2012 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Thursday, March 08, 2012, 8:30 AM Room 152-S
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
On February 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 23, 2012 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed; Yea: 121 Nay: 3
On February 22, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed
On February 17, 2012 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Transportation
On February 8, 2012 in the House:
- Hearing: Tuesday, February 14, 2012, 1:30 PM Room 783 Docking
On February 3, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
On February 2, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Votes (2)
March 20, 2012: Final Action - Passed
February 23, 2012: Final Action - Passed
+ − Sponsors (96)
Type:
Primary Sponsor