+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On June 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Died in Senate Committee
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 120 Nay: 0
- Engrossed on Friday, March 11 , 2016
On March 11, 2016 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Health and Human Services
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Rereferred to Committee on Health and Human Services
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Health and Human Services
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing: Thursday, February 11, 2016, 1:30 PM Room 546-S
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing: Wednesday, February 10, 2016, 1:30 PM Room 546-S-CANCELLED
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services
- Introduced
+ − Amendment
CR_2016_HB2607_H_3529
Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Appropriations
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Health and Human Services
Type:
Primary Sponsor