+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 28, 2012 in the House:
- Approved by Governor on Wednesday, 28 March 2012
On March 26, 2012 in the House:
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, March 23, 2012
On March 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Passed; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
On March 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed
On March 12, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary
On March 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Monday, March 12, 2012, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
On February 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 20, 2012 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 20, 2012 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed; Yea: 121 Nay: 0
On February 15, 2012 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
On February 10, 2012 in the House:
- Hearing: Tuesday, February 14, 2012, 1:30 PM Room 144-S
On February 3, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
On February 2, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Votes (2)
March 15, 2012: Final Action - Passed
February 20, 2012: Final Action - Passed
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
Type:
Primary Sponsor