+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On May 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Died in Senate Committee
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Tuesday, March 18, 2014, 8:30 AM Room 159-S
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed; Yea: 123 Nay: 0
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing: Tuesday, February 18, 2014, 3:30 PM Room 346-S
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources
- Introduced
+ − Vote
February 26, 2014: Final Action - Passed
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources
Type:
Primary Sponsor