+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 30, 2014 in the House:
- Approved by Governor on Wednesday, 16 April 2014
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, April 08, 2014
On April 4, 2014 in the House:
- Concurred with amendments; Yea: 121 Nay: 0
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
On March 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as further amended
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Knox was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Knox
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Thursday, March 13, 2014, 10:30 AM Room 346-S
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 123 Nay: 0
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On February 21, 2014 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing: Tuesday, February 18, 2014, 9:00 AM Room 218-N
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Children and Seniors
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (3)
FA_2014_HB2577_S_4240
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Knox was adopted
CR_2014_HB2577_S_3966
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
CR_2014_HB2577_H_3569
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
+ − Votes (3)
April 4, 2014: Concurred with amendments
March 25, 2014: Final Action - Passed as amended
February 26, 2014: Final Action - Passed as amended
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
Type:
Primary Sponsor