+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On May 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Died in Senate Committee
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed; Yea: 96 Nay: 21
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Hearing: Wednesday, February 07, 2018, 01:30 PM Room 152-S
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
- Introduced
+ − Amendment
CR_2018_HB2568_H_3341
Committee of the Whole - Be passed
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
Type:
Primary Sponsor