+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On June 1, 2012 in the House:
- Approved by Governor on Friday, 25 May 2012
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Monday, May 21, 2012
On May 17, 2012 in the House:
- Reengrossed on Wednesday, 16 May 2012
On May 14, 2012 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 114 Nay: 2
- Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
On April 25, 2012 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 37 Nay: 2
- Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
- Conference committee report now available
On March 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- Motion to accede adopted; Senator Owens, Senator King and Senator Haley appointed as conferees
On March 26, 2012 in the House:
- Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Colloton , Representative Kinzer and Representative McCray-Miller as conferees
On March 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On March 19, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary
On March 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Tuesday, March 06, 2012, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
On February 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 22, 2012 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 22, 2012 in the House:
- Engrossed on Wednesday, 22 February 2012
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 123 Nay: 0
On February 21, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On February 16, 2012 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
On February 10, 2012 in the House:
- Hearing: Wednesday, February 15, 2012, 1:30 PM Room 144-S
On February 1, 2012 in the House:
- Hearing: Tuesday, February 07, 2012, 1:30 PM Room 144-S
- Hearing: Tuesday, February 07, 2012, 1:30 PM Room 144-S
On January 30, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
On January 27, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (3)
CCR_2012_HB2568_S_5318
Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
CR_2012_HB2568_S_4974
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
CR_2012_HB2568_H_4172
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
+ − Votes (4)
May 14, 2012: Conference Committee Report was adopted
April 25, 2012: Conference Committee Report was adopted
March 21, 2012: Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended
February 22, 2012: Final Action - Passed as amended
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
Type:
Primary Sponsor