+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 27, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by Governor on Thursday, March 24 , 2016
On March 22, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, March 22, 2016
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Consent Calendar and placed on General Orders
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Tuesday, March 08, 2016, 10:30 AM Room 144-S
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Committee on Education; Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- Engrossed on Monday, February 22 , 2016
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Rubin was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Rubin
- Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 124 Nay: 0
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Peck
- Representative Ruiz raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled not germane.
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Veterans, Military and Homeland Security
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing: Tuesday, February 16, 2016, 9:00 AM Room 152-S
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- Withdrawn from Committee on Education; Referred to Committee on Veterans, Military and Homeland Security
On January 28, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (3)
FA_2016_HB2567_H_3635
Representative Ruiz raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled not germane.
FA_2016_HB2567_H_3624
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Rubin was adopted
CR_2016_HB2567_H_3481
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Veterans, Military and Homeland Security
Type:
Primary Sponsor