+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 25, 2012 in the House:
- Approved by Governor on Thursday, 12 April 2012
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 06, 2012
On March 30, 2012 in the House:
- Reengrossed on Friday, 30 March 2012
- Concurred with amendments in conference; Yea: 108 Nay: 15
On March 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Motion to accede adopted; Senator Taddiken, Senator Teichman and Senator Francisco appointed as conferees
On March 21, 2012 in the House:
- Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Powell , Representative Kerschen and Representative Wetta as conferees
On March 20, 2012 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
On March 19, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On March 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Agriculture
On March 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Tuesday, March 13, 2012, 7:30 AM Room 159-S
On February 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture
On February 22, 2012 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 22, 2012 in the House:
- Engrossed on Wednesday, 22 February 2012
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 110 Nay: 13
On February 21, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
On February 17, 2012 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources
On February 8, 2012 in the House:
- Hearing: Wednesday, February 15, 2012, 9:00 AM Room 783 Docking
On January 30, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources
On January 27, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (2)
CR_2012_HB2563_S_4733
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
CR_2012_HB2563_H_4194
Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
+ − Votes (3)
March 30, 2012: Concurred with amendments in conference
March 20, 2012: Final Action - Passed as amended
February 22, 2012: Final Action - Passed as amended
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor