+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 16, 2012 in the House:
- Approved by Governor on Wednesday, 16 May 2012
On May 11, 2012 in the House:
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, May 11, 2012
On May 8, 2012 in the House:
- Reengrossed on Tuesday, 08 May 2012
On May 7, 2012 in the House:
- Concurred with amendments in conference; Yea: 118 Nay: 2
On May 4, 2012 in the House:
- Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
On April 25, 2012 in the Senate:
- Motion to accede adopted; Senator Owens, Senator King and Senator Haley appointed as conferees
On April 25, 2012 in the House:
- Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Kinzer , Representative Patton and Representative Pauls as conferees
On March 29, 2012 in the Senate:
- Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator V. Schmidt was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator V. Schmidt
On March 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Committee on Ways and Means and re-referred to Committee of the Whole
On March 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
On March 20, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary
On March 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Monday, March 12, 2012, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
On February 29, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 23, 2012 in the House:
- Engrossed on Wednesday, 22 February 2012
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 124 Nay: 0
On February 22, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On February 17, 2012 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary
On February 1, 2012 in the House:
- Hearing: Tuesday, February 07, 2012, 9:00 AM Room 784-DSOB
- Hearing: Tuesday, February 07, 2012, 3:30 PM Room 346-S
On January 30, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On January 27, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (2)
CR_2012_HB2562_H_4233
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
FA_2012_HB2562_S_5304
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator V. Schmidt was adopted
+ − Votes (3)
May 7, 2012: Concurred with amendments in conference
March 29, 2012: Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended
February 23, 2012: Final Action - Passed as amended
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Judiciary
Type:
Primary Sponsor