+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On June 1, 2012 in the House:
- Died on Calendar
On March 16, 2012 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Taxation
On February 1, 2012 in the House:
- Hearing: Friday, February 10, 2012, 3:30 PM Room 783-DSOB
- Hearing: Thursday, February 09, 2012, 3:30 PM Room 783-DSOB
- Hearing: Wednesday, February 08, 2012, 3:30 PM Room 783-DSOB
- Hearing: Monday, February 06, 2012, 1:30 PM Room 346-S
On January 27, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Taxation
On January 26, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Amendment
CR_2012_HB2560_H_4913
Died on Calendar
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Taxation
Type:
Primary Sponsor