+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On June 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Died in Senate Committee
On March 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Thursday, March 15, 2012, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
On March 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 29, 2012 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 29, 2012 in the House:
- Engrossed on Tuesday, 28 February 2012
On February 23, 2012 in the House:
- Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 90 Nay: 34
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Ward was withdrawn
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Ward
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar
On February 21, 2012 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Commerce and Economic Development
On February 1, 2012 in the House:
- Hearing: Thursday, February 09, 2012, 1:30 PM Room 785-DSOB
On January 27, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Economic Development
On January 26, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (2)
CR_2012_HB2558_H_4293
Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar
FA_2012_HB2558_H_4429
Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
+ − Vote
February 23, 2012: Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Commerce and Economic Development
Type:
Primary Sponsor