+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 27, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by Governor on Monday, March 28 , 2016
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, March 25, 2016
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Passed; Yea: 36 Nay: 4
On March 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Federal and State Affairs
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Wednesday, March 16, 2016, 10:30 AM Room 144-S
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 114 Nay: 8
- Engrossed on Tuesday, March 08 , 2016
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Federal and State Affairs
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing: Thursday, February 04, 2016, 9:00 AM Room 346-S
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (2)
CR_2016_HB2549_S_4039
Committee of the Whole - Be passed
CR_2016_HB2549_H_3476
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Federal and State Affairs
Type:
Primary Sponsor