+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Died in Senate Committee
On March 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
On March 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On March 13, 2020 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 115 Nay: 1
- Engrossed on Thursday, March 12, 2020
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Ruling of the chair was sustained Yea: 81 Nay: 38
- Representative Carpenter, B. raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled not germane.
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Hodge
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Appropriations
On February 12, 2020 in the House:
- Hearing: Wednesday, February 12, 2020, 9:00 AM Room 112-N
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Introduced
+ − Sponsor
Joint Committee on Special Claims Against the State
Type:
Primary Sponsor