+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Approved by Governor on Monday, 31 March 2014
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, March 25, 2014
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Consent Calendar Passed Yea: 40 Nay: 0
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Wednesday, March 12, 2014, 10:30 AM Room 548-S
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
On February 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 17, 2014 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed; Yea: 120 Nay: 0
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing: Thursday, February 06, 2014, 9:00 AM Room 112-N
On January 31, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Introduced
+ − Votes (2)
March 19, 2014: Consent Calendar Passed
February 17, 2014: Final Action - Passed
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Appropriations
Type:
Primary Sponsor