+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 27, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by Governor on Thursday, March 24 , 2016
On March 22, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, March 22, 2016
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Consent Calendar Passed Yea: 39 Nay: 0
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Tuesday, March 08, 2016, 10:30 AM Room 144-S
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 121 Nay: 0
- Engrossed on Wednesday, February 17 , 2016
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development
On February 5, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing: Tuesday, February 09, 2016, 1:30 PM Room 346-S
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development
- Introduced
+ − Amendment
CR_2016_HB2536_H_3389
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Federal and State Affairs
Type:
Primary Sponsor