+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 21, 2012 in the House:
- Approved by Governor on Tuesday, 20 March 2012
On March 16, 2012 in the House:
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, March 16, 2012
On March 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Consent Calendar Passed Yea: 40 Nay: 0
On February 29, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by Committee on Judiciary
On February 22, 2012 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Wednesday, February 29, 2012, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
On February 17, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 16, 2012 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 96 Nay: 28
- Engrossed on Thursday, 16 February 2012
On February 15, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On February 8, 2012 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
On January 27, 2012 in the House:
- Hearing: Tuesday, January 31, 2012, 1:30 PM Room Room 144-S
On January 26, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
On January 25, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Amendment
CR_2012_HB2535_H_3934
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
+ − Votes (2)
March 7, 2012: Consent Calendar Passed
February 16, 2012: Final Action - Passed as amended
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
Type:
Primary Sponsor