+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 16, 2012 in the House:
- Approved by Governor on Wednesday, 16 May 2012
On May 11, 2012 in the House:
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, May 11, 2012
On May 8, 2012 in the House:
- Reengrossed on Tuesday, 08 May 2012
- Concurred with amendments in conference; Yea: 121 Nay: 0
- Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
On March 20, 2012 in the Senate:
- Motion to accede adopted; Senator Owens, Senator King and Senator Haley appointed as conferees
On March 20, 2012 in the House:
- Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Colloton , Representative Kinzer and Representative McCray-Miller as conferees
On March 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
On March 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On March 12, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary
On February 29, 2012 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Thursday, March 08, 2012, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 23, 2012 in the House:
- Engrossed on Wednesday, 22 February 2012
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 124 Nay: 0
On February 22, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On February 20, 2012 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
On February 1, 2012 in the House:
- Hearing: Thursday, February 09, 2012, 1:30 PM Room 144-S
On January 26, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
On January 25, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (2)
CR_2012_HB2534_S_4625
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
CR_2012_HB2534_H_4253
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
+ − Votes (3)
May 8, 2012: Concurred with amendments in conference
March 15, 2012: Final Action - Passed as amended
February 23, 2012: Final Action - Passed as amended
+ − Sponsors (41)
Type:
Primary Sponsor