+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On June 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Died in Senate Committee
On February 29, 2012 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Thursday, March 08, 2012, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 23, 2012 in the House:
- Engrossed on Thursday, 23 February 2012
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 123 Nay: 1
On February 22, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Meier was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Meier
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On February 20, 2012 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary
On February 1, 2012 in the House:
- Hearing: Wednesday, February 08, 2012, 3:30 PM Room 346-S
- Hearing: Wednesday, February 08, 2012, 3:30 PM Room 346-S
On January 26, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On January 25, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (2)
FA_2012_HB2533_H_4381
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Meier was adopted
CR_2012_HB2533_H_4260
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
+ − Vote
February 23, 2012: Final Action - Passed as amended
+ − Sponsors (39)
Type:
Primary Sponsor