+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On June 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Died in Senate Committee
On March 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Wednesday, March 14, 2012, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
On February 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 20, 2012 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 20, 2012 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 85 Nay: 36
- Engrossed on Monday, 20 February 2012
On February 17, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Burroughs was rejected
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Burroughs
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On February 7, 2012 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Commerce and Economic Development
On January 27, 2012 in the House:
- Hearing: Thursday, February 02, 2012, 1:30 PM Room 785 Docking
On January 26, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Economic Development
On January 25, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (2)
FA_2012_HB2531_H_4237
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Burroughs was rejected
CR_2012_HB2531_H_3892
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
+ − Vote
February 20, 2012: Final Action - Passed as amended
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Commerce and Economic Development
Type:
Primary Sponsor