+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On June 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Died in Senate Committee
On March 20, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On March 19, 2012 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On March 16, 2012 in the House:
- Engrossed on Friday, 16 March 2012
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 116 Nay: 8
On March 15, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On March 7, 2012 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary
On February 1, 2012 in the House:
- Hearing: Monday, February 06, 2012, 3:30 PM Room 346-S
On January 25, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On January 24, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Amendment
CR_2012_HB2521_H_4539
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
+ − Vote
March 16, 2012: Final Action - Passed as amended
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Federal and State Affairs
Type:
Primary Sponsor