+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On May 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Died on Senate General Orders
On March 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Tuesday, March 8, 2022, 10:30 AM Room 346-S
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On March 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 23, 2022 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed; Yea: 121 Nay: 0
On February 22, 2022 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed
On February 10, 2022 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
On February 1, 2022 in the House:
- Hearing: Tuesday, February 1, 2022, 1:30 PM Room 546-S
On January 20, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
- Introduced
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
Type:
Primary Sponsor