+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- Approved by Governor on Tuesday, 25 March 2014
On March 21, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, March 21, 2014
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Consent Calendar Passed Yea: 39 Nay: 0
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Wednesday, March 05, 2014, 9:30 AM Room 546-S
On February 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance
On February 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed; Yea: 118 Nay: 0
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing: Wednesday, January 29, 2014, 3:30 PM Room 152-S
On January 27, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Insurance
- Introduced
+ − Votes (2)
March 12, 2014: Consent Calendar Passed
February 10, 2014: Final Action - Passed
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Insurance
Type:
Primary Sponsor