+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On May 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Died on Senate General Orders
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Tuesday, March 18, 2014, 1:30 PM Room 118-N
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 123 Nay: 0
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing: Tuesday, February 11, 2014, 1:30 PM Room 546-S
On January 27, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (2)
CR_2014_HB2509_S_4102
Died on Senate General Orders
CR_2014_HB2509_H_3596
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
+ − Vote
February 27, 2014: Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Vision 2020
Type:
Primary Sponsor