+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On May 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Died in Senate Committee
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed; Yea: 122 Nay: 0
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing: Wednesday, February 12, 2014, 1:30 PM Room 218-N
On January 27, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Government Budget
- Introduced
+ − Vote
February 19, 2014: Final Action - Passed
+ − Sponsor
Committee on General Government Budget
Type:
Primary Sponsor