+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On June 1, 2012 in the House:
- Approved by Governor on Thursday, 31 May 2012
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, May 25, 2012
- Engrossed on Sunday, 20 May 2012
On May 20, 2012 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 105 Nay: 11
- Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
On May 19, 2012 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 34 Nay: 0
- Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
- Conference committee report now available
On May 18, 2012 in the House:
- Representative Pauls replaces Representative Grant on the Conference Committee
- Representative Patton replaces Representative Hermanson on the Conference Committee
- Representative Kinzer replaces Representative Shultz on the Conference Committee
On May 10, 2012 in the House:
- Representative Grant replaces Representative McCray-Miller on the Conference Committee
- Representative Hermanson replaces Representative Kinzer on the Conference Committee
- Representative Shultz replaces Representative Colloton on the Conference Committee
On March 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Motion to accede adopted; Senator Owens, Senator King and Senator Haley appointed as conferees
On March 21, 2012 in the House:
- Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Colloton , Representative Kinzer and Representative McCray-Miller as conferees
On March 20, 2012 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
On March 19, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On March 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary
On February 29, 2012 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Monday, March 05, 2012, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
On February 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 22, 2012 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 22, 2012 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed; Yea: 123 Nay: 0
On February 21, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed
On February 14, 2012 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
On February 1, 2012 in the House:
- Hearing: Monday, February 06, 2012, 1:30 PM Room 144-S
On January 23, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
On January 20, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (2)
CCR_2012_HB2494_S_5729
Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
CR_2012_HB2494_S_4834
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
+ − Votes (4)
May 20, 2012: Conference Committee Report was adopted
May 19, 2012: Conference Committee Report was adopted
March 20, 2012: Final Action - Passed as amended
February 22, 2012: Final Action - Passed
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
Type:
Primary Sponsor