+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On May 23, 2022 in the House:
- Died in Committee
On April 26, 2022 in the House:
- Motion to withdraw from Committee on Taxation not adopted; Yea: 48 Nay: 74
On April 25, 2022 in the House:
- Motion to withdraw from Committee on Taxation pending
On January 25, 2022 in the House:
- Hearing: Tuesday, January 25, 2022, 3:30 PM Room 346-S
On January 14, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Taxation
- Introduced
+ − Sponsors (43)
Type:
Primary Sponsor