+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On May 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Died in Senate Committee
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Thursday, March 01, 2018, 10:30 AM Room 346-S
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed; Yea: 122 Nay: 0
On February 2, 2018 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by Committee on Judiciary
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- Hearing: Monday, January 22, 2018, 03:30 PM Room 112-N
On January 17, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced
+ − Amendment
CR_2018_HB2474_H_3026
Final Action - Passed; Yea: 122 Nay: 0
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Judiciary
Type:
Primary Sponsor