+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 26, 2012 in the House:
- Approved by Governor on Monday, 26 March 2012
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, March 23, 2012
On March 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Passed; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
On March 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed
On March 12, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary
On February 22, 2012 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Friday, March 02, 2012, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 21, 2012 in the House:
- Engrossed on Tuesday, 21 February 2012
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 123 Nay: 0
On February 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 20, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Brookens was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Brookens
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On February 7, 2012 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary
On January 25, 2012 in the House:
- Hearing: Monday, January 30, 2012, 3:30 PM Room 346-S
On January 19, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On January 18, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (2)
CR_2012_HB2473_H_3914
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
FA_2012_HB2473_H_4136
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Brookens was adopted
+ − Votes (2)
March 15, 2012: Final Action - Passed
February 21, 2012: Final Action - Passed as amended
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Judiciary
Type:
Primary Sponsor