+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 28, 2012 in the House:
- Approved by Governor on Wednesday, 28 March 2012
On March 26, 2012 in the House:
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, March 23, 2012
On March 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed
On March 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary
On March 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Tuesday, March 13, 2012, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
On February 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 20, 2012 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 17, 2012 in the House:
- Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 118 Nay: 0
On February 16, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
On February 9, 2012 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary
On January 25, 2012 in the House:
- Hearing: Thursday, February 02, 2012, 3:30 PM Room 346-S
On January 18, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On January 17, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Amendment
CR_2012_HB2470_H_3962
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
+ − Votes (2)
March 15, 2012: Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed
February 17, 2012: Final Action - Substitute passed
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
Type:
Primary Sponsor